Scribe Post

Wednesday, March 4, 2009
Today I am going to be talking about just one thing.

So today in class Mr. H put a question about a wire going from a tree to the roof of a house, and you had to figure out the length of the wire. Here's the question.

How long is the wire that runs from the base of the tree to the roof of the house in the drawing? Round to the nearest hundredth place.
From here on you just do what you normally do when you have a right triangle.

( Don't mind the cat hehe. That's my cat Felix by the way. :] )
a² + b² = c²
23² + 36² = c²
(23 x 23) + (36 x 36) = c²
484 + 1269 = c²
1780 = c²
√1780 = √c²
42.19 = c
Which then makes c 42.19.

That's really the only thing I have to put in my scribe today.

Remember:
- We have a test tomorrow.

- Also, do the rectangle homework (as well as this). There will be a scribe from someone else for that one. It is also on the blog.

Have a good night everyone!

3 comments:

  1. Abbie8-16 said...

    awesome scribe. I like that you put your cat in the tree, now we need someone to get your cat out of the tree.

    March 4, 2009 at 8:38 PM  

  2. jessP,816 said...

    My answers different from yours. I got 23x23=529 and 36x36=1296? :S

    March 4, 2009 at 10:38 PM  

  3. peachy 8-41 said...

    AWWW. :) GREAT COLORS, GREAT PICTURES, GREAT SCRIBE! HAAHAH :), The colors really stood out to me, and it really DID catch my attention! I liked the way you used your colors for this scribe. You talked about everything wonderfulllyy. :D. It was fun to read. Just watch out your answer. Make sure you always double check your work so that you wouldn't mess up on a test. It was well done and very bright :D. Thanks for putting up the reminders too btw! Must have helped a ton of people who forgot ;p. So, i'll just help you out and do the question with the correct numbers

    a² + b² = c²
    23² + 36² = c²
    (23 x 23) + (36 x 36) = c²
    529 + 1296 = c²
    1825 = c²
    √1825 = √c²
    42.72 = c
    Which then makes c 42.72.

    So, yea. That's how it would be, I think I did it correctly! Haha, anyways. Good Job. :) Double check your work next time!

    Haha, nice cat. :)


    And I also got different answers for yours. 23x23=529 and 36x36=1296.

    March 10, 2009 at 12:39 PM  

Post a Comment